CA SB864 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7.6.5 (commencing with Section 16418.8) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to add Section 11011 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to budget reserves, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Budget Deficit Savings Account: Safety Net Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB864 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4926.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16418.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11011 | New Code | See Bill Text |