CA SB865 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the Budget Act of 2010.
Title
Budget Act of 2010.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB865 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-22 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3271.) To Assembly. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-15 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |