CA SB865 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2013 (Chapters 20 and 354 of the Statutes of 2013) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2013: augmentation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB865 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Assembly - SB 865 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB865 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Assembly - SB 865 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB865 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3908.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5515.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5515.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 5524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3134.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |