CA SB865 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4216, 4216.1, 4216.2, 4216.3, 4216.4, 4216.6, 4216.12, and 4216.17 of the Government Code, relating to excavations.
Title
Excavations: subsurface installations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 865 Hill Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB865 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB865 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB865 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB865 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3839.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3663.) (June 9). |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3525.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 4216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4216.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |