CA SB875 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25102 of the Corporations Code, relating to securities offerings.
Title
Qualified securities offerings: exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-04 | Set for hearing April 7. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-01-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_875&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_875_bill_20100111_introduced.html |