CA SB905 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 465 and 496.5 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: theft from a vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB905 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Assembly - SB 905 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Zbur (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB905 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Assembly - SB 905 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Zbur (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB905 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 6243.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 6106.) |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 19). |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4137.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3963.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3449.) (April 2). |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 465 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 496.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |