CA SB918 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 700, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 700, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13350 and 13521 of, and to add Chapter 7.3 (commencing with Section 13560) to Division 7 of, the Water Code, relating to water recycling.
Title
Water recycling.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB918 Pavley (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Assembly - SB 918 Pavley Senate Third Reading By DE LA TORRE (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB918 Pavley (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Assembly - SB 918 Pavley Senate Third Reading By DE LA TORRE (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB918 Pavley (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 700, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-07 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4924.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-25 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6672.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6425.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-10 | To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3736.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3669.) | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-10 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3299.) | |
2010-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-03-26 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3037.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-03-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-03-12 | Set for hearing March 24. | |
2010-02-11 | To Coms. on HEALTH and EQ. | |
2010-02-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |