CA SB918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23786 of, and to add Section 25248 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: special nonprofit sales license: wine labels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 918 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB918 G.O (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB918 G.O (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5279.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3525.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25248 | New Code | See Bill Text |