CA SB929 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to validate the organization, boundaries, acts, proceedings, and bonds of public bodies, and to provide limitations of time in which actions may be commenced, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Validations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 929 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB929 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB929 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5279.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (May 11). |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | March 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |