CA SB930 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 99, 185, 301, 329, 1003, and 14001.1 of, and to add Division 2.5 (commencing with Section 11000) to, the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions: cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Hertzberg et al (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Hertzberg et al (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and B. & P. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 4400.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4299.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4810.) (April 25). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4744.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and GOV. & F. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 1003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 11000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 14001.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 329 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |