CA SB934 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12921.3 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: complaints.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12921.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_934&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0901-0950/sb_934_bill_20160202_introduced.html |