CA SB934 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 10.2 (commencing with Section 14130) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal justice.
Title
Criminal justice: California Violence Intervention and Prevention Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4699.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14130 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13399 | Amended Code | Citation Text |