CA SB934 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50650.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 23701, 23701r, and 23772 of, and to repeal and add Section 23778 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 5168 of the Vehicle Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Corporate taxes: exempt organizations: filing fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 934 Bates Senate Third Reading By Choi (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB934 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB934 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5201.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3817.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3576.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 21. |
2020-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | March 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50650.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23772 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23778 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 5168 | Amended Code | Citation Text |