CA SB934 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 104215) of Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to cancer.
Title
California Childhood Cancer Research Fund Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB934 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB934 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-07-29 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3984.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3775.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3510.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3273.) (March 30). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104215 | New Code | See Bill Text |