CA SB953 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21113 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: parking: public grounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 953 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #15 SB953 Roth (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #15 SB953 Roth (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5915.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3236.) (April 22). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |