CA SB954 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12419.8 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Controller: offset payments.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 954 Liu Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB954 Liu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB954 Liu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6016.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3120.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-23 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-22 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-06 | Set for hearing March 21. | |
2012-03-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-01-06 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12419.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |