CA SB959 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100503 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1357.500, 1357.503, 1366.6, 1367.005, 1367.006, 1374.21, 1385.03, 1385.11, 1389.25, and 1399.849 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10112.27, 10112.28, 10112.3, 10113.9, 10181.3, 10181.11, 10199.1, 10753.05, and 10965.3 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB959 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 959 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Hernandez (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 959 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Hernandez (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4756.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6300.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 3597.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3705.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2991.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |