CA SB960 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3083.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3083.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39601.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
State Air Resources Board: regulations: Office of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3083.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-03-19 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2010-03-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2010-02-08 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time. | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |