CA SB965 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 84750.6 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Community colleges: funding: San Francisco Community
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3254.) (April 24). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 84750.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |