CA SB987 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1318, 1318.1, 11105, 13101, and 13300 of the Penal Code, relating to pretrial release.
Title
Pretrial release: pretrial assessment agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB987 Menjivar (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB987 Menjivar (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4186.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3967.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3283.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1318.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |