CA SB988 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11349.95 to the Government Code, relating to regulations, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Regulations: 5-year review and report.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Aanestad [R] | Sen. Dave Cogdill [R] | Sen. Dave Cox [R] | Sen. Robert Dutton [R] |
Sen. Dennis Hollingsworth [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] | Sen. George Runner [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-05-12 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-05-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3357.) | |
2010-04-08 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-09 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |