CA SB996 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51938 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Comprehensive sexual health education and human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) prevention education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51938 | Amended Code | Citation Text |