CA SCR13 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to declaring Schoolbus Drivers Day.
Title
Schoolbus Drivers Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Assembly - SCR 13 Harman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR13 Harman (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR13 Harman (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-05-23 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-05-19 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1455.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-14 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 655.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |