CA SCR135 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Arthritis Awareness Month.
Title
Arthritis Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Assembly - SCR 135 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Bates (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Bates (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4961.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3872.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |