CA SCR141 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Slavic Heritage Day.
Title
Slavic Heritage Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR141 Nielsen Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR141 Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR141 Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4219.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5278.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3960.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |