CA SCR141 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month.
Title
Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - SCR 141 Moorlach Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR141 Moorlach et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR141 Moorlach et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5080.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |