CA SCR163 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
Title
Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SCR 163 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR163 Fuller (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR163 Fuller (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |