CA SCR29 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Autism Awareness Month.
Title
California Autism Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SCR29 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - SCR 29 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR29 Pavley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - SCR 29 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR29 Pavley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |
2011-05-23 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-05-18 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-05-12 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-14 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-14 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 651.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |