CA SCR42 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-26)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-26)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 50th Anniversary of the California Prayer Breakfast.
Title
California Prayer Breakfast.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR42 Huff (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR42 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR42 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2011-06-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1249.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-05-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-05-23 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1517.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-12 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-12 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 960.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |