CA SCR6 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Vallejo Police Officer James Capoot Memorial Highway.
Title
Vallejo Police Officer James Capoot Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SCR6 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR6 Wolk (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR6 Wolk (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-29 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 580.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 391.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |