CA SCR6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Celebrate Freedom Week.
Title
Celebrate Freedom Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |