CA SCR6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Title
Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Assembly - SCR 6 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR6 Bradford (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR6 Bradford (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-02-10 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2021-02-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 268.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 28). |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 78.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |