CA SCR64 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on August 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on August 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Americans with Disabilities Act.
Title
Americans with Disabilities Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Young Kim [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SCR64 Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SCR 64 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR64 Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SCR 64 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR64 Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2204.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1872.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |