CA SCR67 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Food Allergy Awareness Week.
Title
Food Allergy Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Assembly - SCR 67 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR67 Huff (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR67 Huff (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-05-17 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-14 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3405.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |