CA SCR7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Black April Memorial Month.
Title
Black April Memorial Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Tyler Diep [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR7 Umberg et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 390.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Umberg. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Umberg. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |