CA SCR74 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Brain Injury Awareness Month.
Title
Brain Injury Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR74 Gaines (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR74 Gaines (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-31 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6738.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-29 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |
2012-08-06 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-29 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-03-29 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3040.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-03-28 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-13 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |