CA SCR74 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to HIV viral load suppression.
Title
HIV viral load suppression.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Assembly - SCR 74 Wiener Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR74 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR74 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4531.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3002.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |