CA SCR76 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SCR 76 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR76 Corbett (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR76 Corbett (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-17 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6181.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-10 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 10.) | |
2010-08-05 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-07-01 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2010-07-01 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4198.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |