CA SCR8 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to X-linked adrenoleukodystrophy.
Title
Adrenoleukodystrophy Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SCR8 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR8 Fuller (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR8 Fuller (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-26 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1872.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Fuller. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |