CA SJR12 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fatherhood.
Title
Fatherhood.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio. | |
2012-08-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-08 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-21 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |