CA SJR12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Equal Rights Amendment.
Title
Equal Rights Amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Assembly - SJR 12 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR12 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR12 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5710.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3473.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (March 29). |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |