CA SJR13 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Navy North Hangar Fire.
Title
Navy North Hangar Fire: contamination cleanup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Assembly - SJR 13 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Newman et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Newman et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-17 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2024-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6117.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3870.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3468.) (April 3). |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |