CA SJR7 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to large capacity ammunition magazines.
Title
Large Capacity Ammunition Feeding Device Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Assembly - SJR7 Padilla Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-07-07 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Padilla (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-07 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Padilla (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-14 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 2347.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 7). | |
2011-07-01 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-27 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-27 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1575.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1421.) (June 14). | |
2011-06-07 | Set for hearing June 14. | |
2011-06-02 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-23 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |