CA SJR7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to physicians.
Title
Medical residency programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Assembly - SJR7 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Pan (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Pan (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2179.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |