CA SJR7 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to salmon fishery restoration.
Title
Public resources: salmon: fishery restoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SJR 7 McGuire Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 McGuire et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 McGuire et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 3486.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 11). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2226.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 10. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1517.) (June 13). |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Set for hearing June 13. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |