CA SJR7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Merrill’s Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act.
Title
Military and veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Assembly - SJR 7 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2402.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 963.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |