CA SR70 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 3325.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 3325.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Transgender Day of Visibility.
Title
Relative to Transgender Day of Visibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] |
Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Caroline Menjivar [D] |
Sen. Steve Padilla [D] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Rick Zbur [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR70 Atkins et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 3325.) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |