CA SR84 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to homelessness.
Title
Relative to homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | August 11 hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Set for hearing August 11. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sr_84&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sr_84_bill_20160804_introduced.html |