CO HB1088 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the certification process for the purpose of application for U nonimmigrant status.
Title
U Visa Certification Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 20-1088 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |