CO HB1088 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning peace officer status for certain department of revenue employees.
Title
Peace Officer Status For Certain Department Of Revenue Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Valdez [D] | Sen. Perry Will [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Larry Liston [R] |
Rep. Edith Hooton [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] | Sen. Chris Holbert [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |